Jett-Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sandy L Jett-Williams
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00254
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that this matter be, and the same hereby is, STAYED until May 10, 2021, and, if the case is not settled by then, the parties shall file a joint status report concerning the status of the settlement by May 14, 2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/22/2021. (lber)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Curcio on behalf of Sandy L Jett-Williams (Curcio, Thomas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that counsel shall file within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order a status report, jointly if possible, if not separately, concerning the issues already decided by the previous court and those issues remaining to be decided in this Court, including specifically, but without limitation, the status of discovery, any outstanding or anticipated motions, and whether the parties are ready for trial. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/02/2021. (lber)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04621. Original file and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20898 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04621-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16294902 filed by Sandy L Jett-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jett-Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy L Jett-Williams
Represented By: David P. Matthews
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Represented By: Thomas J. Curcio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?