Mummaw v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Mummaw
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00258
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint MOTION to Stay; directing that this case and all actions in it are hereby STAYED through 90 days after entry of this order to allow the parties to finalize settlement of this case. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/13/2021. (see order for further details)(shea)
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kelly Chermack for Lisa Lynn Mummaw. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/1/2021. (clar, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Chermack and Certification of Local Counsel Amy L. Stone Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7696717. by Lisa Lynn Mummaw. (Stone, Amy)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Management Order, Caldera v. C. R. Bard, Inc., Civ. A. No. CV19-4266 PHX DGC, Doc. 8 (D. Ariz. Jan. 10, 2020))(Busman, Philip)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lorrelle Stone on behalf of Lisa Lynn Mummaw (Stone, Amy)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; directing that attorney Richard B. North, Jr of the law firm of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/9/2021. (shea)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Barnes on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Barnes, David)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that counsel shall file within 15 days from the date of this Order a status report, jointly if possible, if not separately, concerning the issues already decided by the previous court and those issues remaining to be decided in this Court, including specifically, but without limitation, the status of discovery, any outstanding or anticipated motions, and whether the parties are ready for trial. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/2/2021. (shea)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02189. Original file and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. 4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/19/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2189-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16738956 filed by Lisa Lynn Mummaw. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mummaw v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Represented By: David Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Represented By: David Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lynn Mummaw
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Represented By: Amy Lorrelle Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?