Hausauer et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al Kep et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Plaintiff: Gary Zielicke, Brandi Edmondson, Brandon Hausauer, Caralyn Tada and Sara Sharp
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation and Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00332
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that Defendant Capital Ones Motion Doc. No. 1091 and Amazons Joinder Doc. No. 1103 are GRANTED and Virginia law shall apply to the claims asserted in counts 1, 2, 3, 5, and 7 of the Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Certifying a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott,cc/s 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the Motions to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia Doc. Nos. 916 , 1107 are GRANTED, with this day issuing a certification order to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying (996) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (VACATED PURSUANT TO ECF 1294 ))ORDER denying as moot 318 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/4/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott, ) Modified on 5/7/2021 (aott, ).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re (1252) Joint Motion for Page Limit Extensions. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/23/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA, 1:21-cv-00332-AJT-JFA(aott, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Zielicke, Caralyn Tada, Brandi Edmondson, Brandon Hausauer, Sara Sharp. Amazon Web Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Amazon.Com, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Webster, Steven)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Zielicke, Caralyn Tada, Brandi Edmondson, Brandon Hausauer, Sara Sharp. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Capital One, N.A. waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Webster, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7680330.), filed by Gary Zielicke, Caralyn Tada, Brandi Edmondson, Brandon Hausauer, Sara Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hausauer et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al Kep et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Zielicke
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Edmondson
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hausauer
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caralyn Tada
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Sharp
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?