Simpson Jr. v. LLAB Trucking Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Ray Simpson Jr.
Defendant: Robert Dijon Morrisey and LLAB Trucking Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00333
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Robert Dijon Morrisey.(Giordano, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate Regarding Discovery by LLAB Trucking Inc..(Giordano, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate Regarding Discovery by LLAB Trucking Inc..(Giordano, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by LLAB Trucking Inc.. (Giordano, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint by LLAB Trucking Inc., Robert Dijon Morrisey.(Giordano, Joseph) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (klau, ).
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance by Larry Ray Simpson Jr.. Robert Dijon Morrisey served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Locklin, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance by Larry Ray Simpson Jr.. LLAB Trucking Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Locklin, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ray Simpson Jr. Robert Dijon Morrisey served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021 (Locklin, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Ray Simpson Jr. LLAB Trucking Inc. served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021 (Locklin, Kevin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Compliance as to LLAB Trucking INC. (lber)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LLAB Trucking INC., et al. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (lber)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued for service by State Corporation Commonwealth of VA as to LLAB Trucking Inc., Robert Dijon Morrisey. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Larry Ray Simpson Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Process -Commissioner of DMV)(Locklin, Kevin)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Larry Ray Simpson Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Service of Process on the Clerk of the State Corporation Commission)(Locklin, Kevin)
March 19, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against LLAB Truckinbg Inc., Robert Dijon Morrisey ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7680346.), filed by Larry Ray Simpson Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Locklin, Kevin) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson Jr. v. LLAB Trucking Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dijon Morrisey
Represented By: Joseph F. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLAB Trucking Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ray Simpson Jr.
Represented By: Kevin L. Locklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?