Contreras v. Kinkaid et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Contreras
Defendant: 2nd Lt. Spindle, Margarett Gassert, 1st L. Goolsby, A Sergeant/Shift Supervisor EIN #450, Stacey A. Kinkaid, 2nd Lt. Loftie, CPT. D. O'neil, Ms. S. Karpoor, Margaret Gassert, M. B. Ray, Cpt. D. Degeare, MDS DR. Mitchell, Deputy John Doe, Sgt Yard, County of Fairfax, VA, 2nd Lt. Imrich, Major J. Shabazz and Sgt. Warner
Case Number: 1:2021cv00368
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Fairfax, VA, D. Degeare, John Doe, Margaret Gassert, L. Goolsby, Imrich, S. Karpoor, Stacey A. Kinkaid, Loftie, Mitchell, D. O'neil, M. B. Ray, J. Shabazz, Spindle, Warner, Yard, filed by Oscar Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits H-R, #2 Envelope)(shea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 Consent to Collection of Fees by Oscar Contreras. (shea)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (shea)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Oscar Contreras. (shea)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Emergency Motion for an Order Compelling Defendants to Preserve Certain Surveillance Videos; directing that Sheriff Stacey A. Kincaid to preserve the surveillance footage from April 13, 2021, that is identified in plaintiff's motion; directing that plaintiff must file any amended complaint within 30 days of this Order by filing out the attached 1983 complaint form; directing that plaintiff's failure to comply with any part of this Order within 30 days from the entry of this Order, or failure to notify the Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/6/2021. (c/m/w/ forms 5/7/2021 shea)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order directing #1 Complaint be and is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; directing that plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 and an administrative fee of $52.00; granting conditionally #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing that the Clerk request plaintiff's institution to provide an inmate account report form on plaintiff within 30 days of the entry of this Order; directing that plaintiff 's failure to comply with any part of this Order within 30 days from the entry of this Order, or failure to notify the Court immediately upon being transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/6/2021. (see order for further details)(c/m/w forms shea)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency Motion for an Order Compelling Defendants to Preserve Certain Surveillance Videos by Oscar Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shea)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m 3/30/2021 shea)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Intention to Request T.R.O by Oscar Contreras (shea)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oscar Contreras. (shea) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/30/2021) (shea, ).
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against A Sergeant/Shift Supervisor EIN #450, Margarett Gassert, L. Goolsby, Stacey A. Kinnkaid, Loftie, D. O'neil, Spindle, filed by Oscar Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Database, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(shea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Kinkaid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Lt. Spindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarett Gassert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st L. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Sergeant/Shift Supervisor EIN #450
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey A. Kinkaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Lt. Loftie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. D. O'neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. S. Karpoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gassert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. B. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. D. Degeare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDS DR. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Yard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fairfax, VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Lt. Imrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major J. Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?