Che et al v. Agape Health Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Myeong Suk Choi and Kyong Sim Che
Defendant: Jeong Bok Lee and Agape Health Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00408
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 64, 1:20-cv-1047) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 04/23/2021. (tran)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 9, 2001, before Judge T.S. Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 703 299-2100. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2021.(Kaneshiro-Miller, Patricia)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/12/2021. (kgall)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 04/12/2021. (tran)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2021 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Myeong Suk Choi, Kyong Sim Che.Hyunkweon Ryu appeared behalf of the plaintiff. James Victory appeared on behalf of the defendant.Matter argued. #3 -Motion -Denied with Prejudice to the Claims. Court rules all 5 cases will be assigned to a single Magistrate Judge. Parties to contact the Magistrate Judges office to make arrangements for a settlement conference. Order to follow. Court Reporter: P. Kaneshiro-Miller(tran)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration re #4 Declaration by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 8, 2021 Reset Hearing to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 4/9/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tran)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Agape Health Management, Inc., Jeong Bok Lee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jeong Bok LEE)(Victory, James)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Y. Victory on behalf of Agape Health Management, Inc., Jeong Bok Lee (Victory, James)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Agape Health Management, Inc., Jeong Bok Lee. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
April 5, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
April 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/09/2021 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Notice of Hearing, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Retaliation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7703596.), filed by Kyong Sim Che, Myeong Suk Choi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Che et al v. Agape Health Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myeong Suk Choi
Represented By: Hyunkweon Ryu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyong Sim Che
Represented By: Hyunkweon Ryu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeong Bok Lee
Represented By: James Y. Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Health Management, Inc.
Represented By: James Y. Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?