Hilliard v. AmeriGas Propane, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon S. Hilliard
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane, L.P. and James K. Mengel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00409
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER- The Plaintiff shall submit to a medical examination by Dr. Hope (the "examiner") at the Center for Cranial & Spinal Surgery. Any documents, records or studies to be considered by the examiner shall be provided by the defense. Plaintiff will not be required to bring with him any documents or other materials to the examination. Dr. Hope shall provide a dated, written report setting out in detail his findings, including diagnoses, conclusions, and the results of any tests, to defense counsel by no later than July 19, 2021. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/24/2021. (see Order for further details) (dest)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rakin Hamad on behalf of Brandon S. Hilliard (Hamad, Rakin)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Rule 26(F) Discovery Plan ("Joint Discovery Plan") (Docket no. 3), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 4 ), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/03/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/20/21. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Rule 26 Disclosure by All Plaintiffs. (Curcio, Thomas)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AmeriGas Propane, L.P.. (Koch, Janeen)
April 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (ahas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7704578.), filed by James K. Mengel, AmeriGas Propane, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Koch, Janeen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilliard v. AmeriGas Propane, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane, L.P.
Represented By: Janeen Beth Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Mengel
Represented By: Janeen Beth Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon S. Hilliard
Represented By: Thomas J. Curcio
Represented By: Rakin Hamad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?