Baxter v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Baxter
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Christi A Grimm
Case Number: 1:2021cv00451
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 So Ordered re #24 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/07/2021. (dvanm, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm. (Levenson, Rebecca)
May 6, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 26, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Moss, Brandon)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Defendants' consent motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED as follows: a.Defendants will file any response to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before May 7, 2021.b.Plaintiff will file any reply in support of Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before May 17, 2021.c.Plaintiff will notice his motion for preliminary injunction for hearing on May 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/29/2021. (dvanm, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 19, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Moss, Brandon)
April 19, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion for a Briefing Schedule; and it is further ORDERED as follows: a.Defendants will file any response to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before April 30, 2021. b.Plaintiff will file any reply in support of Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction on or before May 10, 2021. c.Plaintiff will notice his motion for preliminary injunction for hearing on May 19,2021 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 04/15/2021. (dvanm, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for a Briefing Schedule by Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Christi A Grimm, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Thomas Johnson for Timothy Baxter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/14/2021. (clar, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ralph Caccia for Timothy Baxter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/14/2021. (clar, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jeremy Joseph Broggi for Timothy Baxter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/14/2021. (clar, )
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Summons to U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons to Attorney General of the United States by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 14, 2021 Notice of Correction re #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified to file proposed summons for USAO and Attorney General. (dvanm, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons to Defendant Christi A. Grimm by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Defendant Xavier Becerra by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Joseph Broggi and Certification of Local Counsel Brandon J. Moss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7721613. by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel Brandon J. Moss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7721604. by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Caccia and Certification of Local Counsel Brandon J. Moss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7721581. by Timothy Baxter. (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Edenton Weeks on behalf of Timothy Baxter (Weeks, Wesley)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Brian Muhlendorf on behalf of Timothy Baxter (Muhlendorf, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Jacob Moss on behalf of Timothy Baxter (Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Timothy Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Timothy Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7721329.), filed by Timothy Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moss, Brandon)
April 13, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Represented By: Peter B. Baumhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi A Grimm
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Represented By: Peter B. Baumhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Baxter
Represented By: Wesley Edenton Weeks
Represented By: Kevin Brian Muhlendorf
Represented By: Brandon Jacob Moss
Represented By: Thomas Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Ralph Caccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?