Epstein v. United Airlines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Epstein and Todd Epstein
Defendant: United Airlines Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc. and Mesa Air Group Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00515
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rachel Epstein, filed by Rachel Epstein.(Mayfield, Earl)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 Discovery Plan by Mesa Airlines, Inc..(Grace, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(tarm)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Plaintiff Todd Epstein's claim of loss of consortium is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and without costs; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants United Airlines, Inc, United Airlines Holdings, Inc., and Mesa Air Group, Inc. are DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE and without costs. Accordingly, this matter will continue with the single Plaintiff, Rachael Epstein, and the single Defendant, Mesa Airlines, Inc.; and Considering that the Motion to Dismiss pertained to Plaintiff Todd Epstein's claim, and that Plaintiff is now dismissed from this action with prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss #6 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 06/02/2021. (dvanm, )
June 1, 2021 Per RDA chambers motions set for 6/23/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc re #11 Notice of Hearing Date (Grace, Kathryn)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Greco, James)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Greco, James)
May 24, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint, #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Grace, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl Neville Mayfield, III on behalf of Rachel Epstein, Todd Epstein (Mayfield, Earl)
May 7, 2021 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint, #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Greco, James)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Greco, James)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint filed by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Epstein's Complaint by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grace, Kathryn)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Peter Greco on behalf of Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc (Greco, James)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mesa Air Group Inc, Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Corrected Cover Sheet by United Airlines Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7759234.), filed by United Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Grace, Kathryn)
April 29, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. The filing user has been notified to sign and refile the civil cover sheet. (dvanm, )
April 29, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epstein v. United Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: James Peter Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: James Peter Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: James Peter Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Air Group Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: James Peter Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Epstein
Represented By: Christopher Michael Day
Represented By: Earl Neville Mayfield, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Epstein
Represented By: Christopher Michael Day
Represented By: Earl Neville Mayfield, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?