Gales v. United Airlines et al
Plaintiff: Karen Gales
Defendant: Jane Doe, ManaAir LLC, United Airlines, Inc, ExpressJet Airlines Inc and ExpressJet Airlines LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00517
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #10 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 2, 2021, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's May 10, 2021, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/27/2021. (lgue, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by ExpressJet Airlines Inc, ExpressJet Airlines LLC, Jane Doe, ManaAir LLC, United Airlines, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 12, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dzir)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir).
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ManaAir LLC. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ExpressJet Airlines Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ExpressJet Airlines LLC. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by United Airlines, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Def ManaAir LLC ANSWER to Complaint by ManaAir LLC.(Grace, Kathryn)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Karen Gales (Molster, Charles)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by United Airlines, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7759442.), filed by Inc. United Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Grace, Kathryn)
April 29, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (kgall)
April 29, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Attorney has been notified via email to refile civil cover sheet with signature and corrected PDF format. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gales v. United Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManaAir LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExpressJet Airlines Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExpressJet Airlines LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gales
Represented By: Robert Taggart Hall
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?