Jones v. Saul
Plaintiff: Arnette Delores Jones
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00536
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General (klau, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew M. Saul served on 5/28/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (klau, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 ALIAS Summons Issued and given to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul (klau, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by U.S. Marshal due to incorrect address as to Andrew M. Saul. (klau, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued and given to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (klau, )
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 5/13/21. (klau, )
April 30, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 -2 2 IFP motion; Please note for future filings that Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis should be filed using the correct event which can be located under Civil Events -> Motions and Related Filings -> Motions -> Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The clerk's office has done so for you in this case, no further action is required.(aott)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arnette Delores Jones. (aott, )
April 29, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Arnette Delores Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Arnette Delores Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP motion)(Gillikin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnette Delores Jones
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?