Pavlov et al v. Hirshfeld
Plaintiff: Dr. Elan Pavlov, Hints, Inc. and Elan Pavlov
Defendant: Andrew Hirshfeld
Case Number: 1:2021cv00573
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elan Pavlov, Hints, Inc.. All Defendants. (Pandya, Brian)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/4/2021, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021.(Thomson, Anneliese)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Andrew Hirshfeld of Response to Court's Inquiry (Chan, Hugham)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, to be further explained in a written opinion to be filed in the future, plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. No. 11] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that defendant immediately take all reasonable and necessary steps, and cause the issuance of all necessary papers, forms, and application data, to vacate the "considered withdrawn" declaration in the PCT/US19/061456 (the'456 application) and restore the status of that application to "pending"; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs, having satisfied all the factors required under Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7 (2008) for a preliminary injunction and there being no contest as to the Court having jurisdiction to resolve the motion, need not post bond. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/4/21. (yguy)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2021. Appearances of counsel. Pltfs #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pandya, Brian)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Andrew Hirshfeld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Chan, Hugham)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction ("Motion for TRO/PI") be filed by close of business Friday, May 28, 2021, not to exceed 25 pages, and plaintiffs reply brief be filed by close of business Wednesday June 2, 2021, not to exceed 15 pages, and it is further ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiffs Motion for TRO/PI will be held in person on Friday, June 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 700. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/19/2021. (lber)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Andrew Hirshfeld (Chan, Hugham)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to set Expedited Briefing Schedule and Notice of Hearing Date June 4, 2021 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/19/2021 (lber).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Elan Pavlov, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Greenspoon, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A (File History), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B (International Bureau), #5 Exhibit Exhibit C (EPO Board of Appeal))(Pandya, Brian)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Hirshfeld and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Summons to Acting USPTO Director by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Attorney General by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hints, Inc.. (Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons (Corrected) by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, (Corrected) by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 3 Financial Disclosure Statement, [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document numbers [1-1,2,3] are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile all documents. (lber)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lber)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Document Removed - Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hints, Inc.. (Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Document Removed - Proposed Summons by Hints, Inc., Elan Pavlov. (Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7773067.), filed by Elan Pavlov, Hints, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet(Document Removed), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Patent File History))(Pandya, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (lber).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavlov et al v. Hirshfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Elan Pavlov
Represented By: Brian Himanshu Pandya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hints, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Himanshu Pandya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elan Pavlov
Represented By: Brian Himanshu Pandya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hirshfeld
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?