Admassu v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Sophia Admassu
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00581
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Initial Pretrial Conference set for 06/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff TERMINATED (per MSN Chambers). (lcre, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by Speedway LLC.(Hundley, Matthew)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Speedway LLC. (Hundley, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Dewayne Lonas on behalf of Speedway LLC (Lonas, Carl)
May 7, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC.(Hundley, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Speedway LLC. (Hundley, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7776644.), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hundley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admassu v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Admassu
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Matthew James Hundley
Represented By: Carl Dewayne Lonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?