Mendoza et al v. Cardinal Multi Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodriguez, Francisco Mendoza and Miguel Martinez
Defendant: Cardinal Multi Services LLC and Wilson O Aguilar
Case Number: 1:2021cv00685
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Notice of Collective Action (Spanish)). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on8/5/2021.(dvanm, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/6/2021) (dvanm, ). Modified to signature page to Spanish version on 8/6/2021 (dvanm, ).
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 Letter Requesting Signature on Notices. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Collective Action (English), #2 Exhibit Notice of Collective Action (Spanish))(Hanna, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 1/14/2022. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION to Certify Class in FLSA Collective Action and Court-Facilitated Notice in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED that: a. A class of people meeting the following definition is conditionally certified under 29 U.S.C. 216(b).b. The Notice and Consent to Join form attached to the Joint Motion as Exhibits A and B are hereby APPROVED to be issued to the above-identified class of potential plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/30/2021. (see Order for further details) (dest)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC.(Ticatch, Micah)
July 20, 2021 Notice of Correction re #17 Notice of Hearing Date. Incorrect docket event used. (clar, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of No Hearing Requested re #16 Consent MOTION to Certify Class in FLSA Collective Action and Court-Facilitated Notice (Hanna, Mark) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (clar, ).
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Certify Class in FLSA Collective Action and Court-Facilitated Notice by Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Join Form, #3 Proposed Order)(Hanna, Mark)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. ORDERED that Defendants' time to file their responsive pleadings to the Complaint is EXTENDED to Thursday, July 29, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/15/2021. (swil)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Multi Services LLC, Wilson O Aguilar. (Ticatch, Micah)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ticatch, Micah)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' time to filed their responsive pleadings to the Complaint is EXTENDED to Thursday, July 15, 2021; and it is further ORDERED that the hearing set for Wednesday, July 14, 2021 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 06/30/2021. (dvanm, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION HEARING by Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ticatch, Micah)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ephram Ticatch on behalf of Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC (Ticatch, Micah)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Lee Isler on behalf of Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC (Isler, Edward)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Notice, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Filing Consents to Join Action with supporting documents, Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Court-Facilitated Notice with supporting documents, Notice of Hearing served on Wilson O. Aguilar on 06/10/2021, filed by Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez. (Hanna, Mark)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Notice, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Filing Consents to Join Action with supporting documents, Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Court-Facilitated Notice with supporting documents, Notice of Hearing served on Cardinal Multi Services LLC on 06/10/2021, filed by Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez. (Hanna, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER continuing the motion for conditional collective action certification and court-facilitated notice to Wednesday, July 14, 2021 at 10:00a.m., to be held in court. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 06/11/2021. (dvanm, )
June 11, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class as Conditional Collective Action and Order Court-Facilitated Notice. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wilson O Aguilar, Cardinal Multi Services LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
June 9, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Certify Class as Conditional Collective Action and Order Court-Facilitated Notice. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons as to Cardinal Multi Services LLC and Wilson O. Aguilar (refiled at request of Case Manager) by Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez. (Hanna, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class as Conditional Collective Action and Order Court-Facilitated Notice by Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Collective Action, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Join Form, #4 Affidavit of Francisco Mendoza, #5 Affidavit of Miguel Martinez, #6 Appendix of Kevin Rodriguez, #7 Affidavit of Rosario Rivera regarding Spanish Translation, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Notice of Hearing)(Hanna, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Mark Hanna on behalf of Miguel Martinez, Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - English Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Named Plaintiffs' Consent Forms, #3 Affidavit of Rosario Rivera regarding Spanish Translation)(Hanna, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7829961.), filed by Francisco Mendoza, Kevin Rodriguez, Miguel Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Summons for Cardinal Multi Services, #3 Appendix Summons for Wilson O. Aguilar)(Hanna, Mark)
June 8, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. Cardinal Multi Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Multi Services LLC
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Represented By: Micah Ephram Ticatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson O Aguilar
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Represented By: Micah Ephram Ticatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodriguez
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Mendoza
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Martinez
Represented By: Mark Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?