Montgomery v. Agape Health Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Myoung Hui MONTGOMERY
Defendant: Sun Ok Lee, Si Yang Lee, Agape Health Management, Inc., dong chul choi, Hye H Yi, Shian Lee, Hui Hyang Lee, Hae Hyang Lee and Si Hyang Lee
Case Number: 1:2021cv00696
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 04:30 PM before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Discovery due by 12/3/2021 (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 08/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Myoung Hui Montgomery by Sun Ok Lee, Dong Chul Choi, Agape Health Management, Inc..(Victory, James) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (klau, ).
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons Returned Executed for Original and amended Complaint, Summons, and Civil Cover Sheet as to Hye H YI aka Si Yang Lee, Shian Lee, Hui Hyang Lee, Hae Hyang Lee, and Si Hyang Lee served on July 14, 2021, answer due 8/4/21, filed by Myoung Hui Montgomery. (Ryu, Hyunkweon) Modified on 7/26/2021 to add answer due date (klau, ).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to Tuesday, August 3, 2021. There will be no further extensions. (Agape Health Management, Inc., Dong Chul Choi and Sun Ok Lee answer due 8/3/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/14/21. (klau, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Opposition to #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint filed by Myoung Hui Montgomery. (Ryu, Hyunkweon)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Agape Health Management, Inc., Dong Chul Choi, Sun Ok Lee. (Victory, James)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Y. Victory on behalf of Agape Health Management, Inc., Dong Chul Choi, Sun Ok Lee (Victory, James)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint as to Hye H Yi. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the Complaint and Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #5 Amended Complaint by Myoung Hui Montgomery. (Ryu, Hyunkweon)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Agape Health Management, Inc., Dong Chul Choi, Sun Ok Lee, Hye H Yi, filed by Myoung Hui Montgomery.(Ryu, Hyunkweon) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (klau, ).
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Agape Health Management, Inc., Dong Chul Choi, Si Yang Lee, Sun Ok Lee. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 11, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
June 11, 2021 Notice of Correction re [1 -1] Civil Cover Sheet, The filing user has been notified that document (1-1) was incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user has already refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 3.(klau, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint - Amended Civil Cover Sheet: related case: 20-1047, Judge T.S. Ellis by Myoung Hui MONTGOMERY. (Ryu, Hyunkweon)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Myoung Hui MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons, #2 proposed summons, #3 proposed summons)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Agape Health Management Inc., Dong Chul Choi, Sun Ok Lee, Si Yang Lee ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7836246.), filed by Myoung Hui Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet)(Ryu, Hyunkweon) Modified text on 6/11/2021 (klau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2021) (klau, ). Modified text on 6/11/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Agape Health Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Ok Lee
Represented By: James Y. Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Si Yang Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Health Management, Inc.
Represented By: James Y. Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dong chul choi
Represented By: James Y. Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hye H Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shian Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hui Hyang Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hae Hyang Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Si Hyang Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myoung Hui MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Hyunkweon Ryu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?