United States v. Dache et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Kathleen M Dache and Gerard R Dache
Case Number: 1:2021cv00719
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America Kathleen M Dache served on 7/17/2021, answer due 8/9/2021 (Mene, Gerard)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America Gerard R Dache served on 7/17/2021, answer due 8/9/2021 (Mene, Gerard)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerard R Dache, Kathleen M Dache. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest)
June 15, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dest )
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Kathleen M. Dache by United States. (Mene, Gerard)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Gerard D. Dache by United States. (Mene, Gerard)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mene, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Dache et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Dache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard R Dache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?