Diaz de Solis v. Mayorkas
Plaintiff: Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Alejandro Mayorkas and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00720
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Docketed in Error and Removed. (lcre, ) Modified on 7/29/2021 (lcre, ).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/8/21. (klau, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis (Goodman, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis as to U.S. Attorney on 6/17/21, answer due 8/16/21. (Goodman, John) Modified text on 6/28/2021 (klau, ).
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 16, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis. (Goodman, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Alejandro Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7842593.), filed by Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Form I-899, Record of Determination, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, John) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz de Solis v. Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor de Maria Diaz de Solis
Represented By: John William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?