KIMFUMU v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: SANDRINE KIMFUMU
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00798
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Amended MOTION to Stay; directing that this action be, and the same hereby is, stayed until further order of this Court; directing that Defendants submit status report to the Court no later than 60 days from the date of the Court's July 22, 2021 #14 Order; directing that USCIS adjudicate Plaintiff asylum application no later that 120 days after Plaintiff's interview with USCIS. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/10/2021. (shea)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Stay by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Loftus, Meghan)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay; directing that the instant action is stayed until further order of this Court; directing that Defendants shall submit a status report to the Court no later than 60 days after the date of this Order; directing that USCIS shall adjudicate Plaintiff's asylum application no later than 120 days after Plaintiff's interview with USCIA. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/22/2021. (shea)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loftus, Meghan)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Loftus on behalf of ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, United States Department of Homeland Security (Loftus, Meghan)
July 9, 2021 Notification of transfer of civil case from the District of Columbia Case No. 1:21cv1299 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01299. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia pursuant to #9 Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #8 ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint All Defendants. Transfer due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/28/21. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/20/21. (DM) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 5/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sandrine Kimfumu re #1 Complaint filed by Sandrine Kimfumu. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Sandrine Kimfumu. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cleveland, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8442532) filed by Sandrine Kimfumu.(Cleveland, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIMFUMU v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRINE KIMFUMU
Represented By: David Laundon Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?