United States of America v. Waheeb G. Antakly et al
Plaintiff: of America United States and United States Of America
Defendant: Waheeb G. Antakly and Maria T. Antakly
Case Number: 1:2021cv00801
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the Consent Motion for an extension of 30-days for Defendant Waheeb Antakly to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED; and, defendant Waheeb Antakly shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action no later than September 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/24/2021. (wgar, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Hearing Date and Waiver of Oral Argument re #26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Mene, Gerard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mene, Gerard)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Olga Lysenko Tobin for United States Of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/10/2021. (clar, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 24 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Olga Lysenko Tobin and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by of America United States. (Mene, Gerard)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/09/2021. (clar, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kristina Marie Portner for of America United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/09/2021. (clar, ) Modified date on 8/10/2021 (clar, ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina Marie Portner and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by of America United States. (Mene, Gerard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Olga Lysenko Tobin and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by of America United States. (Mene, Gerard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Mene on behalf of of America United States (Mene, Gerard)
July 9, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02904. Original file and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2021 Notification of transfer of civil case from the Central District of California Case No. 2:21cv2904 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Approving Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) #16 by Judge R. Gary Klausner, that the Stipulation is in all respects APPROVED. The Clerk of the Court is directed the transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. No further proceedings shall be had in this Court. Case transferred electronically (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Maria T. Antakly waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Maria T. Antakly. (Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Approving Stipulation to Further Extend Response Date #13 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the Stipulation is in all respects APPROVED. The date by which Waheeb G Antakly may respond to the complaint is extended from 7/2/2021, to 7/12/2021. ***NOTE CHANGES MADE BYTHE COURT***. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 08/02/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Further Extend Response Date)(Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Waheeb G. Antakly answer now due 7/2/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Errata, #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Other error(s) with document(s): Using this event will allow you to enter the correct date. Text entry should have "Amended" next to Proof of Service of Summons. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 ; Summons and Complaint was served on Defendant Waheeb G. Antakly on 05/12/2021, Answer due 06/02/2021 (Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Waheeb G. Antakly served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Waheeh Antakly- Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert F Conte counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Robert F. Conte as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Robert F Conte added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Conte, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maria T. Antakly. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Waheeb G. Antakly. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Maria T. Antakly Summons)(Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney John Ellis added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Ellis, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Waheeb G. Antakly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: of America United States
Represented By: John Ellis
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: John Ellis
Represented By: Kristina Marie Portner
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Represented By: Olga Lysenko Tobin
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waheeb G. Antakly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria T. Antakly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?