L.N.P. v. Kijakazi et al
Plaintiff: L.N.P.
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and The Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00820
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certified Mail by L.N.P. as to Kilolo Kijakazi, The Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Argetsinger, Cameron) Modified text on 8/4/2021 (klau, ).
July 29, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Certify Class (Protective). Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date re #9 MOTION to Certify Class (Protective) (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that #13 Motion for Extension of Time and Proposed Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Protective Motion for Class Certification is GRANTED. ORDERED that the briefing schedule and hearing date for Plaintiff's Protective Motion for Class Certification shall be as follows ----- c. Plaintiff shall notice the hearing on the Protective Motion for Class Certification for October 22, 2021 at 10 a.m. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/28/21. (klau, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi, SSA (Social Security Administration), The Social Security Administration (Chan, Hugham)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and Proposed Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Protective Motion for Class Certification by Kilolo Kijakazi, SSA (Social Security Administration), The Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Hugham)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Correction re #9 MOTION to Certify Class (Protective) The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ira Thane Kasdan for L.N.P.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 07/15/2021. (clar, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Certify Class (Protective) filed by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify Class (Protective) by L.N.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Kilolo Kijakazi, The Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
July 13, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ira Thane Kasdan and Certification of Local Counsel Cameron R. Argetsinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7887144. by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Attorney General of the United States by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to The Social Security Administration by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Kilolo Kijakazi by L.N.P.. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Plaintiff's Rule 5.2(g) Reference List [FILED UNDER SEAL] re #1 Complaint,. (Argetsinger, Cameron)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Kilolo Kijakazi and The Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7886843.), filed by L.N.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Audit Report dated March 2014, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Argetsinger, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.N.P. v. Kijakazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.N.P.
Represented By: Cameron Reynolds Argetsinger, II
Represented By: Ira Thane Kasdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Social Security Administration
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?