Sanchez v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Norma Sanchez
Defendant: Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc., Saqan Moore and Auto Assets
Case Number: 1:2021cv00825
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendants' time to file their responsive pleadings to the Complaint is EXTENDED to September 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 09/07/2021. (wgar, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Auto Assets, Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc., Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Saqan Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ray, Steven)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc.. (Stepanick, Evan)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Defendants' time to file their responsive pleadings to the Complaint is EXTENDED to September 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/30/2021. (wgar, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Auto Assets, Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc., Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Saqan Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ray, Steven)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto Assets. (Ray, Steven)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Lee Isler on behalf of Auto Assets, Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Saqan Moore (Isler, Edward)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Ray on behalf of Auto Assets, Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Saqan Moore (Ray, Steven)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021; Dejuan Cornilous Moore served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021; Saqan Moore served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (dvanm, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc., Dejuan Cornilous Moore, Saqan Moore. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw of Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Erroneous Filing be and is hereby granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/21/2021. (swil)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw #4 Amended Complaint by Norma Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Thomas)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Norma Sanchez. (Hennessy, Thomas)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Norma Sanchez.(Hennessy, Thomas)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Theodore Bruce Godfrey for Norma Sanchez. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/19/2021. (clar, )
July 16, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint, Thank you for your recent electronic filing with the Eastern District of Virginia. [Doc. No. 1-1] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form which we have removed. To correctly save the PDF fillable form, click on the File menu select Print, and then select your PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or OK depending on your program. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. Additionally, [Doc. No. 1] contains more than one pleading. (As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the proposed summons separately for each pleading). (swil)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Theodore Bruce Godfrey and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas F. Hennessy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7892206. by Norma Sanchez. (Hennessy, Thomas)
July 14, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7890770.), filed by Norma Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons, #3 Supplement Proposed Summons, #4 Supplement Proposed Summons)(Hennessy, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2021 to remove incorrectly filed pdf fillable form) (swil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Sanchez
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hennessy
Represented By: Theodore Bruce Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dejuan Cornilous Moore
Represented By: Steven W. Ray
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koons of Tysons Corner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saqan Moore
Represented By: Steven W. Ray
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Assets
Represented By: Steven W. Ray
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?