Star v. The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Star
Defendant: The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00828
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Amendment to Motion for Judgment by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shea)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Star The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021 (shea)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to the Court from Michael Star regarding service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shea)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Guardian AD Litem ad Litem.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/4/2021. (see order for details)(c/m 8/4/2021 shea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Guardian AD Litem by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(shea)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.. (c/s usm on 7/23/2021 shea) Modified on 8/26/2021 (shea, ).
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to the Court from Michael Star. (shea)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/14/2021. (c/m 7/15/2021 shea) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2021) (shea, ).
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m on 7/14/21) (klau, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(klau, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Judgment against The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al., filed by Michael Star. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star v. The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Warehouse Bar and Grille, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?