Seo v. Northstar Property Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin C. Seo
Defendant: Northstar Property Management Group, LLC, Rebecca Metzger and Neil Metzger
Case Number: 1:2021cv00886
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance received from Secretary of the Commonwealth as to Rebecca Metzger served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (nneb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance received from Secretary of the Commonwealth as to Neil Metzger served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (nneb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Compliance Northstar Property Management Group, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(aott, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Neil Metzger, Rebecca Metzger, Northstar Property Management Group, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 3, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Justin C. Seo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sutter, Matthew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Northstar Property Management Group, LLC, Rebecca Metzger, Neil Metzger ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7922488.), filed by Justin C. Seo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet)(Sutter, Matthew) Modified text on 8/3/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seo v. Northstar Property Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin C. Seo
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Property Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?