Chen v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Chen
Defendant: Peter Lewis, Barbara Lewis, Patrick Lewis and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00910
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 So Ordered in re #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Vivian Chen. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 09/29/2021. (choy, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vivian Chen (Peterson, George)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Angle, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.(Angle, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Woodson Angle on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Angle, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas John McKee, Jr on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (McKee, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Barbara Lewis, Patrick Lewis, Peter Lewis, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (klau, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Peter Lewis by Vivian Chen. (Peterson, George)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Barbara Lewis by Vivian Chen. (Peterson, George)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Patrick Lewis by Vivian Chen. (Peterson, George)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC by Vivian Chen. (Peterson, George)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Peter W. Lewis, Barbara Lewis, Patrick Lewis, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7938515.), filed by Vivian Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, George) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (klau, ).
August 11, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Chen
Represented By: George Olai Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Robert Woodson Angle
Represented By: Thomas John McKee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?