Duran Contracting LLC v. USCIS et al
Plaintiff: Duran Contracting LLC
Defendant: USCIS and Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 1:2021cv00911
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay; ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/25/2021. (shea) Modified on 9/2/2021 (shea, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay by Tracy Renaud, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-00568. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2021 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia pursuant to Minute Order of 06/04/2021 on Motion to Transfer Case,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case and MOTION to Dismiss filed by DURAN CONTRACTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Green, Sheridan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) (ztd). Modified on 7/22/2021 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheridan Gary Green on behalf of DURAN CONTRACTING LLC (Green, Sheridan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #4 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case and DENIES without prejudice #4 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as moot. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to 21 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/4/2021. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case and, MOTION to Dismiss by TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Simon, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheridan Green Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/18/2021. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sheridan Green, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8278958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DURAN CONTRACTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Haynes, Jim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to TRACY RENAUD, USCIS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8272708) filed by Duran Contracting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Haynes, Jim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran Contracting LLC v. USCIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duran Contracting LLC
Represented By: Sheridan Gary Green
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?