Morales de Santizo et al v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Ana Morales de Santizo and Jose Col Damacio
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2021cv00926
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ana Morales de Santizo, Jose Col Damacio; ordering that the action is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/22/2021. (nneb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Col Damacio, Ana Morales de Santizo (Goodman, John)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 16, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Jose Col Damacio, Ana Morales de Santizo. (Goodman, John)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Ur Mendoza Jaddou ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7944049.), filed by Ana Morales de Santizo, Jose Col Damacio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Form I-130 Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit 2, USCIS Online Case Status Information System, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, John) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales de Santizo et al v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Morales de Santizo
Represented By: John William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Col Damacio
Represented By: John William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?