Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00967
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn)
October 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N Lau on behalf of John Doe (Lau, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Motion for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/16/2021. (aott)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the filing of an action. (kgall) (C/S of docket entry 3 to Copyright Office)
August 23, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (kgall)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 - Report on Filing of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7956069.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciarrino, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Dawn Marie Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Michael N Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?