Cannon v. AMAL LLC
Plaintiff: Luda Cannon
Defendant: ARAM LLC and Aram, LLC doing business as Country Inn & Suites by Radison, Potomac Mills Woodbridge Virginia
Case Number: 1:2021cv01010
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Adam Scotti on behalf of Aram, LLC (Scotti, Brian)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aram, LLC. (Healy, Bryan)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Aram, LLC.(Healy, Bryan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luda Cannon Luda Cannon served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021 (Weintraub, Barry)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aram, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with correct name of defendant against AMAL LLC, filed by Luda Cannon. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS)(Weintraub, Barry)
September 3, 2021 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. Document number #2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. Please refile the document in PDF form. Additionally, defendant's name on the summons does not match the name on the Complaint. (dest)
September 2, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dest)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Luda Cannon. (Weintraub, Barry)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Luda Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weintraub, Barry)
September 2, 2021 Electronic Fee Payment - as to #1 Complaint by Luda Cannon. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7977158.. (Weintraub, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. AMAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luda Cannon
Represented By: Barry Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aram, LLC doing business as Country Inn & Suites by Radison, Potomac Mills Woodbridge Virginia
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Represented By: Bryan James Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?