Racklin v. Zeta Global Corp.
Plaintiff: Melissa Racklin
Defendant: Zeta Global Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01035
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Raphan and Certification of Local Counsel Paul Anthony Werner, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8091903. by Zeta Global Corp.. (Werner, Paul)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Re Handling and Labeling of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/20/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Zeta Global Corp.. (Werner, Paul)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Werner, III on behalf of Zeta Global Corp. (Werner, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan ("Joint Discovery Plan") (Docket no. 12), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 11 ), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 09/28/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Zeta Global Corp.. (Munitz, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.Discovery due by 2/11/2022.Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Lindsay Colvin Stone for Zeta Global Corp. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/20/2021. (kgall)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jonathan Stoler for Zeta Global Corp. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/20/2021. (kgall)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Stone and Certification of Local Counsel Ryan Munitz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8002512. by Zeta Global Corp.. (Munitz, Ryan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Stoler and Certification of Local Counsel Ryan Munitz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8002493. by Zeta Global Corp.. (Munitz, Ryan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Zeta Global Corp..(Munitz, Ryan)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Hicks on behalf of Melissa Racklin (Hicks, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mark Harrison, II on behalf of Melissa Racklin (Harrison, Jonathan)
September 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration re #1 Notice of Removal Declaration of Denise Lang in support by Zeta Global Corp.. (Munitz, Ryan)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zeta Global Corp.. (Munitz, Ryan)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7989205.), filed by Zeta Global Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Munitz, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racklin v. Zeta Global Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Racklin
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Carr
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Represented By: Robert Thomas Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeta Global Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Jennifer Munitz
Represented By: Jonathan Stoler
Represented By: Lindsay Colvin Stone
Represented By: Paul Anthony Werner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?