Virginia Citizens Defense League v. The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence
Plaintiff: Virginia Citizens Defense League
Defendant: The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence
Case Number: 1:2021cv01065
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has twenty-one days to file an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/4/2021. (shea)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2021. Appearance of Counsel. Defendants 42 Motion to Dismiss is taken under Advisement and Order to Follow. (Court Reporter J. Egal) (jlan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence. (Remy, John)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Virginia Citizens Defense League. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to deny motion to dismiss)(Leiser, Phillip)
October 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (dvanm, )
September 24, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 15, 2021 re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Remy, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence. (Remy, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Remy, John)
September 17, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8002491.), filed by The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Remy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virginia Citizens Defense League v. The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Citizens Defense League
Represented By: Phillip B. Leiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coalition To Stop Gun Violence
Represented By: John Michael Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?