Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv01072
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S (MJ)Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 Final Report on the filing or determination of an action. (c/m) (dest )
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER in re #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Strike 3 Holding LLC. ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/5/2021. (dest)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 09/30/2021. (choy, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright. (c/m on 09/23/2021) (choy, )
September 22, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (choy, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 - Report on Filing of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8010108.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciarrino, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Dawn Marie Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?