Williams v. Burgerbusters Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ty Williams
Defendant: Burgerbusters Inc., Burgerbusters III, L.C., Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C., Burgerbusters V, L.L.C., Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C., Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C., Burgerbusters X, L.L.C., Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C. and Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01083
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters X, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters V, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters III, L.C. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ty Williams Burgerbusters Inc. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (Nadas, Rachel)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Burgerbusters III, L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters Inc. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters V, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters X, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021; Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C. answer due 12/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/27/2021. (dvanm, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Burton on behalf of Burgerbusters III, L.C., Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C., Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C., Burgerbusters Inc., Burgerbusters V, L.L.C., Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C., Burgerbusters X, L.L.C., Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C., Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C. (Burton, David)
October 27, 2021 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters X, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters V, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters III, L.C.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Burgerbusters Inc.. (Windsor, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Burgerbusters III, L.C., Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C., Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C., Burgerbusters Inc., Burgerbusters V, L.L.C., Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C., Burgerbusters X, L.L.C., Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C., Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Windsor, Laura)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
September 24, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Ty Williams. (Nadas, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8015627.), filed by Ty Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nadas, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Burgerbusters Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty Williams
Represented By: Rachel Emily Nadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters Inc.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters III, L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters IV, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters V, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters VIII, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters IX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters X, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters XI, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerbusters XII, L.L.C.
Represented By: Laura Denise Windsor
Represented By: David Christopher Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?