Osei et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ms Irene Osei, Lifeline Home Care, Inc. and Irene Osei
Defendant: United States of America and J. Deutsch
Case Number: 1:2021cv01111
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit)(kgall)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Irene Osei. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Kent, Benjamin)
October 15, 2021 Notice of Correction re #4 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons; The filing user has been notified to refile proposed summons as nonfilable pdfs and with correct names and addresses. (shea)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Irene Osei. (Kent, Benjamin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/15/2021) (shea, ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Filed in Error and Removed by Irene Osei. (Kent, Benjamin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). Modified on 10/20/2021 (shea, ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Filed in Error and Removed by Irene Osei. (Kent, Benjamin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). Modified on 10/20/2021 (shea, ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Filed in Error and Removed (Kent, Benjamin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). Modified on 10/20/2021 (shea, ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Filed in Error and Removed filed by Irene Osei. (Attachments: #1 Summon to another defendant, #2 Summon to a third defent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kent, Benjamin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/20/2021) (shea, ). Modified on 10/20/2021 (shea, ).
October 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)
October 5, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint; The filing user has been notified to refile the civil cover sheet. (shea)
October 5, 2021 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons; The filing user has been notified to refile with a separate proposed summons for each party and as a non fillable form. (shea)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Complaint for Damages Due to Unjust Federal Tax Lien by Irene Osei. (Kent, Benjamin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8031539.), filed by Irene Osei. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kent, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osei et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Irene Osei
Represented By: Benjamin Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifeline Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Osei
Represented By: Benjamin Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?