Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. v. Feld Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.
Defendant: Feld Entertainment, Inc. and Feld Motor Sports
Case Number: 1:2021cv01200
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of StandingFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties filed by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Arden B Levy, #2 Exhibit Exh A (Order on MTD - Tina Turner Musical case), #3 Exhibit Exh B (Order on Demurrer - Frantic Case))(Levy, Arden)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kevin John Kieffer for Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/8/2021. (kgall)
December 7, 2021 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin John Kieffer and Certification of Local Counsel Mary C. Zinsner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8140871. by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Zinsner, Mary)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 MOTION to Continue - Motion for a Continuance of the Court's December 17, 2021 Hearing by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. ORDERED that the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss will be continued to the next available hearing date, Friday January 7, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/6/2021. (lber)
December 6, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of Standing First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (lber)
December 3, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of StandingFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephanie Gunson, #2 Exhibit A - Four Policies Issued by Underwriters to Feld, #3 Exhibit B - Cooperation Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - January 27, 2021 Email From Besso, #5 Exhibit D - Feld's State Court Complaint)(Zinsner, Mary)
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 Waiver of re #20 MOTION to Continue - Motion for a Continuance of the Court's December 17, 2021 Hearing Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. (Zinsner, Mary)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Continue - Motion for a Continuance of the Court's December 17, 2021 Hearing by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas S. Hay, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zinsner, Mary)
December 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports of Address Change (Levy, Arden)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Stephen Wah for Feld Entertainment, Inc.,Stephen Wah for Feld Motor Sports. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/30/2021. (clar, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Peter Alexander Halprin for Feld Entertainment, Inc.,Peter Alexander Halprin for Feld Motor Sports. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/29/2021. (clar, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Wah and Certification of Local Counsel Arden Briana Levy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8114535. by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Fed Ct Admissions S Wah)(Levy, Arden)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Alexander Halprin and Certification of Local Counsel Arden Briana Levy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8114500. by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Fed Ct admissions of P Halprin)(Levy, Arden)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Feld Motor Sports. (Levy, Arden)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Feld Entertainment, Inc.. (Levy, Arden)
November 19, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of StandingFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/17/2021 re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of StandingFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties, #11 Memorandum in Support,, (Levy, Arden)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of StandingFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties filed by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Arden B Levy, #2 Exhibit Exh A (FFX Cnty Compl), #3 Exhibit Exh A-A (Primary Policy), #4 Exhibit Exh A-B (First Excess Policy), #5 Exhibit Exh A-C (Second Excess Policy), #6 Exhibit Exh A-D (FMS Policy), #7 Exhibit Exh B (emails), #8 Exhibit Exh C (Traxxas Transcript), #9 Exhibit Exh D (Traxxas Order), #10 Proposed Order)(Levy, Arden)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of Standing, First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to join indispensable parties by Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports. (Levy, Arden)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Arden Briana Levy on behalf of Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports (Levy, Arden)
November 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Magistrate Judge Michael S. (MJ)Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. Feld Motor Sports served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021 (Reza, Syed)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. Feld Entertainment, Inc. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021 (Reza, Syed)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Reza, Syed)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Mohsin Reza on behalf of Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. (Reza, Syed)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Feld Entertainment, Inc., Feld Motor Sports, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
October 28, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (choy, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Zinsner, Mary)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Zinsner, Mary)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BVAEDC-8074894.), filed by Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zinsner, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd. v. Feld Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Represented By: Kevin John Kieffer
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feld Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Arden Briana Levy
Represented By: Peter Alexander Halprin
Represented By: Stephen Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feld Motor Sports
Represented By: Arden Briana Levy
Represented By: Peter Alexander Halprin
Represented By: Stephen Wah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?