Ames v. PNC Bank (Branch)
Plaintiff: Catherine Ames
Defendant: PNC Bank (Branch)
Case Number: 1:2021cv01204
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the Court grants Plaintiff one more opportunity to amend the Complaint. Plaintiff may file a second Amended Complaint within 60 days provided that the complaint complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b) and is not futile. The Court requests that Plaintiff explain succinctly and in plain terms the facts that led her to file this action. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the matter will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/13/2021. (lber c/s)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC Bank (Branch), filed by Catherine Ames. (lber)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER in re #1 Complaint filed by Catherine Ames. The Court finds that the Complaint in this matter fails to meet the required pleading standard. Accordingly, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 60 days provided that the complaint complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b) and is not futile. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/1/2021. (kgall) (C/S to plaintiff)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PNC Bank (Branch). (c/s 11/1/21) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber )
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint filed by Catherine Ames. (lber )
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PNC Bank (Branch) without jury demand, filed by Catherine Ames. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ames v. PNC Bank (Branch)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank (Branch)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?