Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc. et al v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc., Space Adventures Ltd. and Space Adventures, Inc.
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01215
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc., Space Adventures, Inc.. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Ellis, Latosha)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Lorelie Sue Masters for Space Adventures, Inc.,Lorelie Sue Masters for Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/10/2021. (clar, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lorelie Sue Masters and Certification of Local Counsel Latosha Marie Ellis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8083634. by Space Adventures, Inc., Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc.. (Ellis, Latosha)
November 1, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Space Adventures, Inc.. (Ellis, Latosha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc.. (Ellis, Latosha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Space Adventures, Inc., Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc.. (Ellis, Latosha)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8079350.), filed by Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc., Space Adventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Latosha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc. et al v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zero Gravity Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Latosha Marie Ellis
Represented By: Lorelie Sue Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Space Adventures Ltd.
Represented By: Latosha Marie Ellis
Represented By: Lorelie Sue Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Space Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Latosha Marie Ellis
Represented By: Lorelie Sue Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?