Wiser v. SOC LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wiser
Defendant: SOC LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01220
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Proposed Briefing Schedule (see Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/17/2021. (choy, )
December 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing reset for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (choy, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Jeremy Wiser. (Beliles, Benjamin)
December 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 21, 2022 re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Hwang, Joon)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SOC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hwang, Joon)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SOC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hwang, Joon)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on December 17, 2021 be and is cancelled. It is further ORDERED that if defendant plans to file a renewed motion to dismiss he do so on or before Tuesday, December 14, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/29/2021. (choy, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by SOC LLC re #10 Order, (Hwang, Joon)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that defendant promptly notify the Court whether it intends to proceed with its current Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 5] or have the Court deny the Motion without prejudice as moot, cancel the hearing on December 17, 2021, and permit the defendant to file and notice a new motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/29/2021. (choy, )
November 29, 2021 ***Motion Hearing for 12/17/2021 be and is cancelled. (choy, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT in response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss against Jeremy Wiser, filed by Jeremy Wiser.(Beliles, Benjamin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Weipert on behalf of SOC LLC (Weipert, Laura)
November 9, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 17, 2021 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hwang, Joon)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SOC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hwang, Joon)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SOC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hwang, Joon)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by SOC LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Exhibit C to the Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Hwang, Joon)
November 2, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by SOC LLC. (Hwang, Joon)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by SOC LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Hwang, Joon)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8080903.), filed by SOC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2021-09-17 Wiser -- Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Wiser -- Declaration of S. Fast)(Hwang, Joon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiser v. SOC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wiser
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOC LLC
Represented By: Joon Hwang
Represented By: Laura Ann Weipert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?