Hyatt v. Hirshfeld
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Defendant: Andrew Hirshfeld
Case Number: 1:2021cv01226
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Non-Infringement- Patent Applicant is Dissatisfied with PTO Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 4/5/2022. (nneb)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Case by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeLaquil, Mark)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Andrew Hirshfeld (Chan, Hugham)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gilbert P. Hyatt by Andrew Hirshfeld.(Chan, Hugham)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. Andrew Hirshfeld served on 1/20/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney General), #2 Affidavit of Service (U.S. Attorney for the EDVA))(DeLaquil, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Gilbert P. Hyatt (Proposed AO 120 Form) (DeLaquil, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the EDVA by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to the Attorney General of the United States by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (DeLaquil, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8082427.), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaquil, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Hirshfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By: Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hirshfeld
Represented By: Hugham Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?