Tucker v. Massage Envy
Plaintiff: Lisa Tucker
Defendant: Massage Envy and Massage Envy Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01301
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court filed by Lisa Tucker. (Biniazan, Kevin)
January 11, 2022 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. 2 - Cryder Declaration w/ Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Ex. 3-Maiti Declaration)(Setliff, Charles)
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court filed by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Setliff, Charles)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Lisa Tucker re #8 Memorandum in Opposition Corrected Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa Tucker, #2 Exhibit Replacement Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Biniazan, Kevin)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule. ORDERED the Defendant's Response Brief relative to the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court will be accepted as timely if filed by January 11, 2022, and Plaintiff's Reply Brief will be accepted as timely if filed by January 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/3/2022. (kgall)
January 3, 2022 Reset Hearing as to #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court, #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing reset for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tran)
December 30, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Setliff, Charles)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension Modifying Briefing Schedule. ORDERED that the Defendant's Reply Brief to the Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration will be accepted as timely if filed by close of business on Tuesday, January 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/27/2021. (kgall)
December 27, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension Modify Briefing Schedule by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Setliff, Charles)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 28, 2022 re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Setliff, Charles)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Derek Ulreich-Power and Certification of Local Counsel C. Stephen Setliff Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8168382. by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application for PHV Admission)(Setliff, Charles)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bradley David Shwer and Certification of Local Counsel C. Stephen Setliff Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8168372. by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application for PHV Admission)(Setliff, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Lisa Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Biniazan, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court filed by Lisa Tucker. (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Parties and to Remand to State Court by Lisa Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 amended complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex A, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex B, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex C, #5 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex D, #6 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex E, #7 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex F, #8 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex G, #9 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex H, #10 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex I, #11 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex J, #12 Exhibit Amended Complaint Ex K, #13 Proposed Order)(Biniazan, Kevin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Setliff, Charles)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. (Setliff, Charles)
November 24, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massage Envy. (Setliff, Charles)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8119034.), filed by Massage Envy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Setliff, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Massage Envy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massage Envy
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massage Envy Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Tucker
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?