Boundy v. United States Patent and Trademark Office(USPTO)
Plaintiff: DAVID BOUNDY
Defendant: UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (USPTO)
Case Number: 1:2021cv01366
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 1/26/2022. (nneb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wesnousky, Carolyn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 Certificate Reporting Service by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). (Wesnousky, Carolyn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Michaela Wesnousky on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) (Wesnousky, Carolyn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 Certificate Reporting Service by United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) served on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Wesnousky, Carolyn)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Michaela Wesnousky on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) (Wesnousky, Carolyn)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Boundy. United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) served on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Neifeld, Richard)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 Filed in Error and Removed (nneb, ).
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 Filed in Error and Removed (nneb, ).
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 Filed In Error and Removed (nneb, ).
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Office of the General Counsel, United States Patent and Trademark Office on 1/4/2022, filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (nneb, ).
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia served on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (dest). Modified on 1/13/2022 (nneb).
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General of the United States served on 1/4/2022, filed by David Boundy. (Neifeld, Richard) Modified on 1/13/2022 (dest). Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket event (nneb, ).
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (USPTO), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by DAVID BOUNDY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Summons, US Atty, #2 Appendix Proposed Summons, Atty General)(Neifeld, Richard)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by DAVID BOUNDY re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Neifeld, Richard)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Neifeld on behalf of DAVID BOUNDY (Neifeld, Richard)
December 8, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified that document [1-1 and 1-2] are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms and have been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (nneb)
December 7, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (nneb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8140817.), filed by DAVID BOUNDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter Appearance (Form ao458), #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Neifeld, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boundy v. United States Patent and Trademark Office(USPTO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BOUNDY
Represented By: Richard Neifeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (USPTO)
Represented By: Carolyn Michaela Wesnousky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?