Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, INC. et al
Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC and Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Amatea, LLC, John C. Grimberg Co., Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00013
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 0270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE filed by Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/18/2022. (lber)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41 by Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC (DeVan, William)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC. John C. Grimberg Co., Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (DeVan, William)
January 7, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lber)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States f/u/b/o Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC. (DeVan, William)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by United States f/u/b/o Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC. (DeVan, William)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8185276.), filed by United States f/u/b/o Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10)(DeVan, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC
Represented By: William Arthur DeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grounded Electrical Construction, LLC
Represented By: William Arthur DeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amatea, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Grimberg Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?