Caldwell v. United States of America
Plaintiff: CALDWELL JOSHUA, B C CALDWELL, A C CALDWELL, TSGT Joshua Caldwell, B.C. and A.C.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Unitd States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00111
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Caldwell, A.C., B.C.. Unitd States of America served on 2/14/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Regan, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Caldwell, A.C., B.C.. Unitd States of America served on 2/17/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Regan, Patrick)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jamal K Alsaffar for A.C.,Jamal K Alsaffar for B.C.,Jamal K Alsaffar for Joshua Caldwell. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 02/08/2022. (clar, )
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Steven Haspel for A.C.,Steven Haspel for B.C.,Steven Haspel for Joshua Caldwell. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 02/08/2022. (clar, )
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Haspel and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick M. Regan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8232129. by A.C., B.C., Joshua Caldwell. (Regan, Patrick)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jamal Alsaffar and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick M. Regan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8232078. by A.C., B.C., Joshua Caldwell. (Regan, Patrick)
February 4, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (shea)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8225795.), filed by CALDWELL JOSHUA, A C CALDWELL, B C CALDWELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Regan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALDWELL JOSHUA
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B C CALDWELL
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A C CALDWELL
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSGT Joshua Caldwell
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Represented By: Steven Haspel
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.C.
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Represented By: Steven Haspel
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: Jamal Alsaffar
Represented By: Steven Haspel
Represented By: Patrick M. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitd States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?