Ahadi v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Ahadi
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2022cv00284
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/9/2022. (nneb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/10/2022) (nneb, ).
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Stay by Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit) (lber)
March 16, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lber)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Emmanuel Ahadi. (Goodman, John)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8296236.), filed by Emmanuel Ahadi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, I-94, Arrival/Departure Record, #2 Exhibit 2, USCIS Online Case Status Information System, #3 Exhibit 3, Letter to USCIS, #4 Exhibit 4, USPS Shipping Labels and Tracking Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahadi v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Ahadi
Represented By: John William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?