Borromeo v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Borromeo
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS and UR M. Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2022cv00289
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Shirley Borromeo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney General's FOIA Guidelines)(Tousley, Thomas)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 Waiver of re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Waiver of Hearing by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (Baumhart, Peter)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Baumhart, Peter)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Baumhart, Peter)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Baumhart on behalf of UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (Baumhart, Peter)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before April 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 04/07/2022. (wgar, )
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumhart, Peter)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shirley Borromeo. All Defendants. (Tousley, Thomas)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UR M. Jaddou, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons DHS, USCIS, USA, AG by Shirley Borromeo. (Tousley, Thomas)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8297947.), filed by Shirley Borromeo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit FOIA Request 2014, #3 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter 2014, #4 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter 2014, #5 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2014, #6 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter 2014, #7 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2014, #8 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Decision Letter 2014, #9 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Documents, #10 Exhibit FOIA Request Mother 2018, #11 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter Mother 2018, #12 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2019, #13 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents Mother 2019, #14 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter Mother 2019, #15 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2019, #16 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Decision Letter 2019, #17 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter 2021, #18 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter 2021, #19 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2021, #20 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter 2021, #21 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Acknowledgment Letter 2021, #22 Exhibit USCIS Appeal Response Letter 2021, #23 Exhibit FOIA Record Documents 2021, #24 Exhibit USCIS Acknowledgment Letter Mother Mother 2021, #25 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2021, #26 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Letter Mother 2021, #27 Exhibit USCIS Response Letter Mother 2022)(Tousley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borromeo v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Borromeo
Represented By: Thomas Harry Tousley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Peter B. Baumhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. Jaddou
Represented By: Peter B. Baumhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?