Orlina v. Clarke
Petitioner: Christopher Santos Orlina
Respondent: Harold W. Clarke
Case Number: 1:2022cv00417
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that, petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt. No. 14] be and is GRANTED and he shall have until Monday, July 11, 2022 to file his response. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/13/2022. (dvanm, c/m 6/13/2022)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and Prepare a Brief in Reply to Respondent's #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Rule 5 Answer with Roseboro by Christopher Santos Orlina. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dvanm)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Brief in Support to #12 Response to Habeas Petition, #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Rule 5 Answer with Roseboro,. filed by Harold W. Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 Part 1 of 8, #12 Exhibit 11 Part 2 of 8, #13 Exhibit 11 Part 3 of 8, #14 Exhibit 11 Part 4 of 8, #15 Exhibit 11 Part 5 of 8, #16 Exhibit 11 Part 6 of 8, #17 Exhibit 11 Part 7 of 8, #18 Exhibit 11 part 8 of 8, #19 Exhibit 12)(Mshar, Maureen)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Rule 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Harold W. Clarke.(Mshar, Maureen)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Rule 5 Answer with Roseboro,. by Harold W. Clarke. (Mshar, Maureen)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Waiver of Oral Argument by Harold W. Clarke (Mshar, Maureen)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Roseboro Notice by Harold W. Clarke (Mshar, Maureen)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order State Court Records Received from Virginia Beach Circuit Court (thumb drive in manila env.) (dvanm, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 State Court Records Received from Supreme Court of Virginia. (1 banded packet) (dvanm)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 State Court Records Received from Court of Appeals of Virginia. (1 manila folder) (dvanm, rec sent to staff attorney office)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Elizabeth Mshar on behalf of Harold W. Clarke (Mshar, Maureen)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Elizabeth Mshar on behalf of Harold W. Clarke (Mshar, Maureen)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Santos Orlina. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(dvanm)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the petition [Dkt. No. 1] be and is FILED; and it is further ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, respondent show cause why the writ should not be granted (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 04/27/2022. (dvanm, c/m 4/29/2022)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 4/19/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 14683094703.), filed by Christopher Santos Orlina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter, #3 Data Sheet, #4 Receipt, #5 Envelope)(dvanm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlina v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Santos Orlina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold W. Clarke
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Mshar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?