Shaw v. Austin
Plaintiff: Bernadetta Shaw
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Case Number: 1:2022cv00428
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Response to #6 Order filed by Bernadetta Shaw. (jlan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Lloyd J. Austin, III filed by Bernadetta Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jlan)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the Plaintiff must file a complaint with her signature, and all future filings must be either signed by plaintiff or counsel of record on her behalf. Any pro se pleadings must be accompanied by the attached certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(dvanm, c/m by chambers 5/18/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 14683095144 (swil)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lloyd J. Austin, III, filed by Bernadetta Shaw.(kgall)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Bernadetta Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(kgall)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (kgall) (C/S to plaintiff)
April 18, 2022 Notice of Correction in re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each relief being requested. (kgall)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lloyd J. Austin, III, filed by Bernadetta Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Envelope)(kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadetta Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?