New York Life Insurance Company v. Strickland et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sidney Strickland and Laura Conley
Case Number: 1:2022cv00673
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Interpleader Discharge and Dismissal (Dkt. 22) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff be and is DISMISSED from this civil action. It is further ORDERED that Defendants are hereby enjoined from initiating or prosecuting any other proceeding against Plaintiff seeking payment of the death benefit at issue. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/18/2023. (nlop)
March 20, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by New York Life Insurance Company re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Discharge of Waiver of Hearing (Murdock, John)
March 20, 2023 Filing 23 Declaration re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and Discharge by Justine Pfeiffer by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
March 20, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and Discharge by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Application, #4 Exhibit C - Change of Name, #5 Exhibit D - POA, #6 Exhibit E - Email and Change Beneficiary, #7 Exhibit F - Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit G - Death Benefits Proceeds Form, #9 Exhibit H - Statement of Sidney Strickland, #10 Exhibit I - Laura Conley Letter October 2021, #11 Exhibit J - Laura Conley Letter November 2021, #12 Exhibit K - Laura Conley Letter December 2021, #13 Exhibit L - Petition Caveat)(Murdock, John)
March 10, 2023 Filing 21 Receipt of Interpleader Funds in the amount of $41,771.96 deposited into registry of Court by New York Life Insurance. (nlop)
March 3, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by New York Life Insurance Company of Service of Initial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures to Defendants)(Murdock, John)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED that:1. The Company's motion is hereby GRANTED.2. Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, the Company shall issue to the Clerk of this Court a check equal to the sum of $39,414.50, representing the Death Benefit, plus applicable interest, if any;3. The Clerk of Court shall deposit said funds into an interest-bearing account pending further direction from the Court in re #17 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 3/2/2023. (swil)
February 27, 2023 Filing 18 Waiver of Hearing by New York Life Insurance Company (Murdock, John)
February 24, 2023 Notice of Correction in re #17 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (nlop)
February 15, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murdock, John)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Philip R. Murray for Laura Conley. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 2/15/2023. (swil)
February 15, 2023 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held (via teleconference) before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/15/2023.Counsel for Plaintiff, counsel for Defendant Laura Conley and Pro Se Defendant Sidney Strickland enter their appearance.Parties advise the Court of case status.The Court DIRECTS the parties to meet and confer and to file a Motion or Proposed Order with the Court in two (2) weeks, by 03/01/2023.Court Reporter: S. Wallace(pmil, )
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip Raymond Murray and Certification of Local Counsel Arturo Hernandez Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8802720. by Laura Conley. (Hernandez, Arturo)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 12) and at the initial pretrial conference held on November 2, 2022 and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 11), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by February 10, 2023. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by November 15, 2022. 4. Parties requested expert disclosure schedule is denied. Expert disclosures shall be governed by Local Civil Rule 26(D). Specifically, expert disclosures shall be due from plaintiff by December 12, 2022, and from defendants by January 11, 2023. Rebuttal reports from plaintiff, if any, shall be due by January 26, 2023. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court. 5. The Final Pretrial Conference shall be held on February 15, 2023. 6. If the parties believe that a settlement conference with the court would be of assistance in resolving this dispute, they may arrange a settlement conference by contacting the undersigned magistrate judges chambers. (see Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 11/2/22. (tfitz, )
November 2, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/2/2022. Appearances of counsel via telephone. Joint Discovery Plan adopted as amended. Order to follow. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
October 24, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/2/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
October 19, 2022 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by New York Life Insurance Company.(Murdock, John)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Discovery due by 2/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 09/27/22. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(pmil, )
September 26, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Laura Conley.(Hernandez, Arturo)
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by New York Life Insurance Company Regarding Defendant Laura Conley's Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murdock, John)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader by Sidney Strickland.(swil)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Interpleader Complaint served on Laura Conley on July 15, 2022, filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Interpleader Complaint served on Sidney Strickland on July 15, 2022, filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Laura Conley, Sidney Strickland, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Laura Conley by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Sidney Strickland by New York Life Insurance Company. (Murdock, John)
June 14, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (jlan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8430810.), filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Murdock, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/15/2022) (jlan, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Strickland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Conley
Represented By: Arturo Hernandez
Represented By: Philip R. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?