Travelers Personal Insurance Company v. VSB Community Builders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Defendant: VSB Community Builders, LLC, Michael Pearson doing business as Pearson Electric and Rumialdy Enterprises, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: ANNE KATHERINE GRIEB
Cross Defendant: Michael Pearson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00833
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Summons re #12 Third Party Complaint to Anne Katherine Grieb by VSB Community Builders, LLC. (Conn, Lacey)
September 19, 2022 Filing 12 Third Party Complaint against ANNE KATHERINE GRIEB, filed by VSB Community Builders, LLC.(Conn, Lacey)
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter F. Asmer, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan S. Rochkind Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8570387. by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Supplement North Carolina certification)(Rochkind, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company All Defendants (Rochkind, Jonathan)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER in re #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Michael Pearson. ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Defendant amend the filing to comply with this Court's local civil rules including Rule 83.1 and this Court's Pro Se Reference Handbook; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file the executed or unexecuted summons on the docket within twenty-one (21) days of this Order or else this case will be dismissed without prejudice (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/2/2022. (nlop, ) (c/s pursuant to Order) Modified docket text on 9/6/2022 (nlop, ).
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 CROSSCLAIM against Michael Pearson, Rumialdy Enterprises, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Michael Pearson, Rumialdy Enterprises, LLC, filed by VSB Community Builders, LLC.(Conn, Lacey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by VSB Community Builders, LLC. (Conn, Lacey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by VSB Community Builders, LLC.(Conn, Lacey)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Plaintiff amend the filing to comply with this Court's local civil rules including Rule 83.1 and this Court's Pro Se Reference Handbook, available at https://tinyurl.com/b6935dk4, which requires that a pro se party only represent themselves and not an entity; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file the executed or unexecuted summons on the docket within twenty-one (21) days of this Order or else this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/31/2022. (nlop) (c/s pursuant to Order)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(nlop, )
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Pearson, Rumialdy Enterprises, LLC, VSB Community Builders, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit)(kgall)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Michael Pearson, #2 Summons - Rumialdy Enterprises)(Rochkind, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint 1:22-cv-833 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8486284.), filed by Travelers Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Residential Sales Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex B - inspection contingency removal addendum, #4 Appendix)(Rochkind, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Personal Insurance Company v. VSB Community Builders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan S Rochkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSB Community Builders, LLC
Represented By: Lacey Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pearson doing business as Pearson Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumialdy Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ANNE KATHERINE GRIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michael Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?