Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andrea Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00848
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Martin. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/18/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavits of Mailing)(Goss, John)
August 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan, )
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to comply with the following schedule (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(kgall)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Andrea Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Forms, #4 USM-285 Forms, #5 USM-285 Forms)(Goss, John)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8494365.), filed by Andrea Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goss, John)
July 27, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (kgall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Martin
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?