Doss v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kathleen Doss
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00852
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kenneth R. Hiller for Kathleen Doss. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/14/2022. (nneb)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S Attorney served on 9/12/2022, answer due 11/11/2022. (nneb) Modified on 9/13/2022
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Hiller and Certification of Local Counsel Robert W. Gillikin, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8563781. by Kathleen Doss. (Gillikin, Robert)
August 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Attorney General served on 8/15/2022 (nneb)
August 11, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (nneb)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General to be served by USMS (nneb)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and it is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the Clerk of the Court shall initiate service of the Complaint and Summons on the defendant (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nneb)
July 29, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Kathleen Doss. (Attachments: #1 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION In Forma Pauperis re #1 Complaint by Kathleen Doss. (Gillikin, Robert)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Kathleen Doss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Doss
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?